NY S05367 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.426
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a health care provider or facility which has determined to cease to do business or which is transferring its ownership, at least thirty days prior to such action to provide a copy of its plan for transfer of patient records to another provider, facility or practitioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a health care provider or facility which has determined to cease to do business or which is transferring its ownership, at least thirty days prior to such action to provide a copy of its plan for transfer of patient records to another provider, facility or practitioner.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.426
2019-10-17SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading cal.131
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a2349
2019-06-13Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1106
2019-04-29SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A02349 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - substituted by s5367

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback