NY S05372 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.641
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a notice of conveyance of real property to be sent to the owners of record of residential real property; provides persons filing for conveyance shall bear the cost of mailing.
Title
Provides for a notice of conveyance of real property to be sent to the owners of record of residential real property; provides persons filing for conveyance shall bear the cost of mailing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.641 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.216 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a440a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1557 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A00440 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - SIGNED CHAP.641