NY S05387 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.181
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the creation of a thirteen member advisory board within the department of agriculture and markets on food safety and inspection programs; such board is to advise, counsel and confer with the commissioner of agriculture and markets on matters dealing with enforcement of laws and regulations regarding food safety and protection and shall make recommendations regarding any necessary statutory or regulatory changes.
Title
Requires the creation of a thirteen member advisory board within the department of agriculture and markets on food safety and inspection programs; such board is to advise, counsel and confer with the commissioner of agriculture and markets on matters dealing with enforcement of laws and regulations regarding food safety and protection and shall make recommendations regarding any necessary statutory or regulatory changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 111 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.181 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.247 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a5176 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1190 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A05176 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - VETOED MEMO.181