NY S05394 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-11 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-11 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows boards of education, upon written petition of twenty-five qualified voters or five percent of the number of voters who voted in the previous annual election of the members of the board of education, whichever is greater, to provide transportation to and from school for a child residing within the two or three mile designated area to use an already established pick up/drop off location outside of such two or three mile designated area.
Title
Allows boards of education, upon written petition of twenty-five qualified voters or five percent of the number of voters who voted in the previous annual election of the members of the board of education, whichever is greater, to provide transportation to and from school for a child residing within the two or three mile designated area to use an already established pick up/drop off location outside of such two or three mile designated area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.972 |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |