NY S05397 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that certain information be provided to patients and health care practitioners regarding sudden unexpected death in epilepsy.
Title
Requires that certain information be provided to patients and health care practitioners regarding sudden unexpected death in epilepsy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.420 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5397A |
2020-01-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07807 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - advanced to third reading cal.336