NY S05400 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.598
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the city of Albany to accept from Congregation Ohav Shalom an application for exemption from real property taxes pursuant to section 420-a of the real property tax law for the 2018 rolls.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the city of Albany to accept from Congregation Ohav Shalom an application for exemption from real property taxes pursuant to section 420-a of the real property tax law for the 2018 rolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.598 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.177 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a7570 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1191 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07570 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.598