NY S05410 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the cumulative grade point average admission requirement for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the cumulative grade point average admission requirement for graduate-level teacher and educational leader programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.191
2019-06-04Assemblysubstituted for a4538
2019-06-03Assemblyreferred to higher education
2019-06-03SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-29SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.832
2019-04-30SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A04538 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - substituted by s5410

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback