NY S05414 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that not more than twenty per centum of the assets of any fund of the public retirement system shall be invested in foreign equities.
Title
Provides that not more than twenty per centum of the assets of any fund of the public retirement system shall be invested in foreign equities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.784 |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5414F |
2020-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-03-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5414E |
2020-03-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5414D |
2020-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1693 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5414C |
2019-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5414B |
2019-06-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5414A |
2019-06-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07904 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees