NY S05416 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment to divide the state into three autonomous regions; the New Amsterdam Region, the New York Region and the Montauk Region; provides regional governors and regional legislators; provides only for a state sales tax; divides various departments and agencies; provides for separate court systems and prison systems.
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment to divide the state into three autonomous regions; the New Amsterdam Region, the New York Region and the Montauk Region; provides regional governors and regional legislators; provides only for a state sales tax; divides various departments and agencies; provides for separate court systems and prison systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. George Borrello [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] | Sen. Daphne Jordan [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-06 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05498 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - held for consideration in local governments