NY S05427 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - approval memo.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the number of barrels that a restaurant brewer may sell at retail.
Title
Expands the number of barrels that a restaurant brewer may sell at retail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | approval memo.46 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | signed chap.655 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.957 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5427 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2019-05-29 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-29 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.386 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-18 | Senate | referred to economic development |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1971 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.957 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A01971 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - approval memo.46