NY S05433 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - referred to banks
Pending: Assembly Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state chartered banking institutions from investing in and providing financing for private prisons.
Title
Prohibits state chartered banking institutions from investing in and providing financing for private prisons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Banks Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2020-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.338 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1255 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5433A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A07580 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - ordered to third reading rules cal.287