NY S05438 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7070A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7070A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to residency requirements for members of municipal departments of sanitation; removes the five years of service residency issue.
Title
Relates to residency requirements for members of municipal departments of sanitation; removes the five years of service residency issue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7070A |
2018-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5438A |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.613 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1957 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07070 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.220