NY S05438 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - signed chap.419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - signed chap.419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the applicability of plumbing and drainage provisions to the city of Middletown.
Title
Limits the applicability of plumbing and drainage provisions to the city of Middletown.
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Cities 1 Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | signed chap.419 |
2019-10-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.849 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5438 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.535 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-18 | Senate | referred to cities |
2019-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A6751 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.849 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A06751 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - signed chap.419