NY S05439 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5439A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5439A
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of energy to adopt regulations increasing fuel economy standards for passenger vehicles purchased by or for the state or any agency or public authority thereof, and requires that by 2030 all such vehicles shall be battery, electric, plug-in hybrid electric or zero emission vehicles.
Title
Directs the commissioner of energy to adopt regulations increasing fuel economy standards for passenger vehicles purchased by or for the state or any agency or public authority thereof, and requires that by 2030 all such vehicles shall be battery, electric, plug-in hybrid electric or zero emission vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5439A |
2020-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1558 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07567 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to energy