NY S05440 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the council for treatment equity within the office of addiction services and supports.
Title
Establishes the council for treatment equity within the office of addiction services and supports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-03-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.553 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5440A |
2020-02-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A00692 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means