NY S05444 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.141
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to participation in the address confidentiality program; authorizes victims of sexual offenses, human trafficking and stalking to participate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to participation in the address confidentiality program; authorizes victims of sexual offenses, human trafficking and stalking to participate.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-01AssemblySIGNED CHAP.141
2019-07-30SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.284
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a7515
2019-05-14Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2019-05-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-14SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.684
2019-05-14SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-07SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2019-05-01SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A07515 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - substituted by s5444

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback