NY S05449 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5449A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 5449A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the ethical standards for state agency contractors act.
Title
Establishes the ethical standards for state agency contractors act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5449A |
2020-02-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07792 (Same As) 2020-01-06 - enacting clause stricken
A09528 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - reported referred to codes
A09528 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - reported referred to codes