NY S05450 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to treatment programs and treatment court during interim probation supervision.
Title
Relates to treatment programs and treatment court during interim probation supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.279 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.812 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5450 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.541 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-04-30 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-10 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7128 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.812 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07128 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.279