NY S05451 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.700
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.700
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases hotel and motel taxes in the county of Essex from three to five percent.
Title
Increases hotel and motel taxes in the county of Essex from three to five percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.700 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1511 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5451 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.168 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.168 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-03 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7450 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1511 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07450 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.700