NY S05454 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the commission on African American history and achievement.
Title
Relates to establishing the commission on African American history and achievement.
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Marisol Alcantara [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Toby Stavisky [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5454B |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.578 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1726 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5454A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07192 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to education