NY S05457 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 5457A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 5457A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the childhood lead poisoning prevention and safe housing act to make enforcement of lead hazard control standards in the state of New York more certain and more effective; creates a loan fund to assist owners in complying with lead-safe requirements; provides for inspections and certification of inspectors and remediators; requires registration of affected properties; provides tax credits for remediation; provides for appointment of deputy commissioner of housing and community renewal to oversee provisions; provides for educational programs relating to lead poisoning and abatement.
Title
Enacts the childhood lead poisoning prevention and safe housing act to make enforcement of lead hazard control standards in the state of New York more certain and more effective; creates a loan fund to assist owners in complying with lead-safe requirements; provides for inspections and certification of inspectors and remediators; requires registration of affected properties; provides tax credits for remediation; provides for appointment of deputy commissioner of housing and community renewal to oversee provisions; provides for educational programs relating to lead poisoning and abatement.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Sen. Jose Serrano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5457A |
2018-03-28 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10190 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - referred to health