NY S05457 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the use of opioid antagonists by public accommodations for opioid overdose prevention.
Title
Authorizes the use of opioid antagonists by public accommodations for opioid overdose prevention.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Harckham [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.68 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1030 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
Same As/Similar To
A07812 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.148