NY S05466 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.522
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.522
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Southampton, in the county of Suffolk, to issue bonds and notes, for a period of probable usefulness not to exceed 30 years, which shall apply to the object or purpose of constructing or reconstructing underground conduits and related facilities for the protection of public or municipal utility transmission lines.
Title
Authorizes the town of Southampton, in the county of Suffolk, to issue bonds and notes, for a period of probable usefulness not to exceed 30 years, which shall apply to the object or purpose of constructing or reconstructing underground conduits and related facilities for the protection of public or municipal utility transmission lines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.522 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.393 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7396 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1388 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07396 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.522