NY S05476 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - referred to racing and wagering
Pending: Assembly Racing and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to creating the racing fan advisory council.
Title
Relates to creating the racing fan advisory council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.365 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2019-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.657 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A04709 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to racing and wagering