NY S05480 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to establish at least 4 infant recovery centers in areas of need for infants suffering from drug withdrawal as a result of in utero exposure.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to establish at least 4 infant recovery centers in areas of need for infants suffering from drug withdrawal as a result of in utero exposure.
Sponsors
Sen. Gustavo Rivera [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Jen Metzger [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.321 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1326 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A01141 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to health