NY S05489 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2788B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2788B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for taxpayer gifts for lupus education and prevention, and establishes the lupus education and prevention fund and outreach program.
Title
Provides for taxpayer gifts for lupus education and prevention, and establishes the lupus education and prevention fund and outreach program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2788B |
2018-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1788 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5489B |
2018-02-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5489A |
2017-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-03-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02788 (Same As) 2018-10-01 - signed chap.294