NY S05489 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state office for the aging to include reports on older adults who are primary caregivers or guardians of minors and on substance use disorders among older adults in the office's annual reports to the governor and legislature.
Title
Requires the state office for the aging to include reports on older adults who are primary caregivers or guardians of minors and on substance use disorders among older adults in the office's annual reports to the governor and legislature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.501 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.744 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5489 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO AGING |
2019-05-21 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.348 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-02-12 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Senate | referred to aging |
2019-05-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4948 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.744 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A04948 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.501