NY S05492 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 5492A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - PRINT NUMBER 5492A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing certain persons in an optional twenty year retirement plan for state university police officer service and regional state park police.
Title
Relates to authorizing certain persons in an optional twenty year retirement plan for state university police officer service and regional state park police.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5492A |
2020-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07265 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means