NY S05510 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.600
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to appropriation and apportionment of moneys for the promotion of agriculture and domestic arts in the county of Orange.
Title
Relates to appropriation and apportionment of moneys for the promotion of agriculture and domestic arts in the county of Orange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.600 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.585 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a2079 |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1194 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A02079 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.600