NY S05532 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.107
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the prohibition of declawing of cats; makes such violation punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $1,000.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the prohibition of declawing of cats; makes such violation punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $1,000.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-22AssemblySIGNED CHAP.107
2019-07-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.476
2019-06-04Assemblysubstituted for a1303b
2019-06-04Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-06-04SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-03SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1150
2019-06-03SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-05-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 5532B
2019-05-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
2019-05-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 5532A
2019-05-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE
2019-05-06SenateREFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE

Same As/Similar To

A01303 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - substituted by s5532b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05532&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05532&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05532
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05532&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05532A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05532&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05532B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5532#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S5532#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05532&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback