NY S05534 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7976
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7976
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the autism spectrum disorders advisory board to improve outreach to minority group members relating to children with such disorders.
Title
Directs the autism spectrum disorders advisory board to improve outreach to minority group members relating to children with such disorders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7976 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1716 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-06-07 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5534A |
2017-05-09 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2017-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A07976 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.227