NY S05547 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of environmental conservation to promulgate rules and regulations establishing gift cards for hunting and fishing licenses in New York State.
Title
Directs the commissioner of environmental conservation to promulgate rules and regulations establishing gift cards for hunting and fishing licenses in New York State.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-11-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.137 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1609 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5547 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.329 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | rules report cal.329 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-14 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-22 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2050 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1609 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02050 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - tabled