NY S05552 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the creation of a self-sufficiency standard study regarding how much income is needed for a family of a given composition in a given geographic location to adequately meet its basic needs without public or private assistance.
Title
Relates to the creation of a self-sufficiency standard study regarding how much income is needed for a family of a given composition in a given geographic location to adequately meet its basic needs without public or private assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5552A |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2019-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1694 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A00339 (Same As) 2020-02-11 - reported referred to ways and means