NY S05557 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - referred to aging
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the amount of income property owners may earn for the purpose of eligibility for the property tax exemption for persons sixty-five years of age or over and for persons with disabilities and limited income.
Title
Increases the amount of income property owners may earn for the purpose of eligibility for the property tax exemption for persons sixty-five years of age or over and for persons with disabilities and limited income.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrea Stewart-Cousins [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Aging Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2020-01-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.227 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5557A |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2019-05-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.745 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A03149 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - print number 3149a