NY S05565 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-07 - PRINT NUMBER 5565D
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-07 - PRINT NUMBER 5565D
Pending: Senate Banks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing the New York public banking act; authorizes the lending of public credit to public banks and authorizes public ownership of stock in public banks for the purpose of achieving cost savings, strengthening local economies, supporting community economic development, and addressing infrastructure and housing needs for localities.
Title
Relates to establishing the New York public banking act; authorizes the lending of public credit to public banks and authorizes public ownership of stock in public banks for the purpose of achieving cost savings, strengthening local economies, supporting community economic development, and addressing infrastructure and housing needs for localities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5565D |
2020-08-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-07-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5565C |
2020-07-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-06-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5565B |
2020-06-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-02-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5565A |
2020-02-25 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO BANKS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
Same As/Similar To
A09665 (Same As) 2020-08-17 - print number 9665e