NY S05566 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau to transfer ownership of certain parkland to the village of Freeport.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau to transfer ownership of certain parkland to the village of Freeport.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1159 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5566A |
2019-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08128 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments