NY S05571 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - signed chap.147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the East Hampton Volunteer Ocean Rescue and Auxiliary Squad as an emergency rescue and first aid squad; permits such members to display green lights on motor vehicles when engaged in emergency operation.
Title
Designates the East Hampton Volunteer Ocean Rescue and Auxiliary Squad as an emergency rescue and first aid squad; permits such members to display green lights on motor vehicles when engaged in emergency operation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.147 |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.684 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5571 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.272 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-19 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.507 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | rules report cal.507 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-17 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-07 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2020-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7493 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.684 |
2020-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07493 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - signed chap.147