NY S05585 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7218A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7218A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tanning facilities.
Title
Relates to tanning facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7218A |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.198 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5585A |
2017-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2017-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07218 (Same As) 2018-08-16 - signed chap.194