NY S05585 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5585B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5585B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the salary base for members of the city of New York fire department pension fund whose employment with the fire department of the city of New York commenced on or after July 1, 2000 shall be determined in the same manner as members whose employment commenced prior to such date.
Title
Provides that the salary base for members of the city of New York fire department pension fund whose employment with the fire department of the city of New York commenced on or after July 1, 2000 shall be determined in the same manner as members whose employment commenced prior to such date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5585B |
2020-03-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5585A |
2019-05-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08181 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - print number 8181a