NY S05589 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - signed chap.381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - signed chap.381
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that state aid may be provided for up to 90% of the total project approved costs for buildings of public libraries that are located in an economically distressed community.
Title
Provides that state aid may be provided for up to 90% of the total project approved costs for buildings of public libraries that are located in an economically distressed community.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-22 | Senate | signed chap.381 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1048 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5589 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-06 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-06 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.74 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | rules report cal.74 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-08 | Senate | print number 3771a |
2019-05-08 | Senate | amend (t) and recommit to libraries and education technology |
2019-01-31 | Senate | referred to libraries and education technology |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3771A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1048 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03771 (Same As) 2019-10-22 - signed chap.381