NY S05590 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.389
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain coordinated applications for state aid be submitted by the public library system.
Title
Provides that certain coordinated applications for state aid be submitted by the public library system.
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.389 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1049 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5590 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.498 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-31 | Senate | referred to libraries and education technology |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3781 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1049 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03781 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - signed chap.389