NY S05592 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - PRINT NUMBER 5592A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - PRINT NUMBER 5592A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau to lease certain parklands for an additional twenty year period and requires proceeds of such lease to be used by the county of Nassau for park purposes.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau to lease certain parklands for an additional twenty year period and requires proceeds of such lease to be used by the county of Nassau for park purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5592A |
2020-03-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.943 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07630 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments