NY S05593 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.426
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes members of the New York state and local employees' retirement system to repay the loan balance at any time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes members of the New York state and local employees' retirement system to repay the loan balance at any time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.426
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-12Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.102
2018-06-12Assemblysubstituted for a7602a
2018-05-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-05-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-14SenateREPASSED SENATE
2018-04-23SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5593A
2018-04-23SenateVOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING
2018-04-23Senatereturned to senate
2018-04-23AssemblyRECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY
2018-03-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-03-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-03-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-02-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-01-30Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-01-29Senate1ST REPORT CAL.301
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-24Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-23Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1336
2017-04-19SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07602 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - substituted by s5593a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05593&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05593&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05593
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05593&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05593A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5593#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5593#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5593#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5593#SF2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5593#SF3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05593&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback