NY S05594 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Vetoed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.311
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to disability retirement for members of the department of environmental conservation, forest rangers, university police officers and the regional state park police.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to disability retirement for members of the department of environmental conservation, forest rangers, university police officers and the regional state park police.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21AssemblyVETOED MEMO.311
2018-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-12Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.101
2018-06-12Assemblysubstituted for a7600c
2018-05-01Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-05-01SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-01SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-04-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-04-18Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-04-17Senate1ST REPORT CAL.795
2018-02-12SenatePRINT NUMBER 5594C
2018-02-12SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2018-01-16SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-04SenatePRINT NUMBER 5594B
2018-01-04SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-21Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2017-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-21SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2126
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-30SenatePRINT NUMBER 5594A
2017-05-30SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2017-05-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-04-19SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07600 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - substituted by s5594c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05594&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05594&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05594
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05594&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05594A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05594&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05594B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05594&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05594C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5594#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5594#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5594#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5594#SC3
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5594#SC4
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5594#SF2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05594&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback