NY S05604 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - signed chap.583
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - signed chap.583
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to procurement contracts awarded by the Roswell Park Cancer Institute corporation.
Title
Relates to procurement contracts awarded by the Roswell Park Cancer Institute corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.583 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1561 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5604A |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.173 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.173 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Senate | print number 7496a |
2019-06-03 | Senate | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-05-07 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7496A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1561 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5604A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2019-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07496 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - signed chap.583