NY S05609 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporates resource conservation, energy efficiency, green technologies, and alternative and renewable energy measures of project applicants into a uniform tax exemption policy.
Title
Incorporates resource conservation, energy efficiency, green technologies, and alternative and renewable energy measures of project applicants into a uniform tax exemption policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.386 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1610 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5609 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-16 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.328 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | reported |
2019-03-12 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1606 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1610 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A01606 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - signed chap.386