NY S05611 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.604
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.604
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows deputy sheriffs Matthew Ashton, Bradley Hamilton, and Joshua Whitney, to join the optional twenty-five year retirement plan, county of Washington.
Title
Allows deputy sheriffs Matthew Ashton, Bradley Hamilton, and Joshua Whitney, to join the optional twenty-five year retirement plan, county of Washington.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.604 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.651 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7434 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1823 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07434 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.604