NY S05614 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.689
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.689
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits commercial leases from including a waiver of the right to a declaratory judgment action and states that the inclusion of such a waiver in a commercial lease shall be null and void as against public policy.
Title
Prohibits commercial leases from including a waiver of the right to a declaratory judgment action and states that the inclusion of such a waiver in a commercial lease shall be null and void as against public policy.
Sponsors
Sen. John Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.689 |
2019-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1346 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5614 |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-09 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.284 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | reported |
2019-01-23 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A2554 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1346 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02554 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.689