NY S05622 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to the department of environmental conservation's management of aquatic invasive species, spread prevention and penalties.
Title
Extends provisions relating to the department of environmental conservation's management of aquatic invasive species, spread prevention and penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-20 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.685 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |