NY S05636 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes boards of cooperative educational services to enter into certain contracts with out-of-state schools related to existing technology products, including computer programs and software packages that help students learn and assist districts with achieving greater efficiencies; defines "out-of-state public school"; changes the term "common core" to "next generation" standards or curriculum.
Title
Authorizes boards of cooperative educational services to enter into certain contracts with out-of-state schools related to existing technology products, including computer programs and software packages that help students learn and assist districts with achieving greater efficiencies; defines "out-of-state public school"; changes the term "common core" to "next generation" standards or curriculum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.67 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1053 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5636A |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-03 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | amended on third reading 7654a |
2019-05-23 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.459 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-14 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7654A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED 5636A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1053 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07654 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.67